Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/23/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/13/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/13/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/20/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/11/2014