Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/26/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 05/09/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/20/2013