Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/24/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/24/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/24/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/24/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/14/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/03/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/08/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/24/2013