Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 05/13/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/11/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/02/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/02/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 01/27/2014