Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/17/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/17/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 04/17/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/17/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 04/17/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/17/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/23/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/23/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 04/23/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/23/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/24/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/24/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/24/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/24/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/24/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/24/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/24/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 04/25/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/26/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/26/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/26/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/26/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/30/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/30/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/30/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/06/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 05/07/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/07/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/08/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 05/08/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 05/09/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/14/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 05/14/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 05/16/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 05/22/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 05/22/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 05/23/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 05/23/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/11/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/11/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 06/11/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/11/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/11/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/11/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/12/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 06/12/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/13/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/13/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/13/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/13/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/13/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/18/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/25/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/26/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/26/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/28/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 07/11/2013