Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 05/07/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/16/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/16/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/08/2014