Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/17/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 04/17/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/17/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/08/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 08/02/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/09/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 02/28/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/28/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/11/2014