Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/16/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 04/16/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 04/16/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/24/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/24/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/07/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/07/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/10/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 09/30/2013