Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/16/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/16/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/24/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/25/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/25/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/24/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 03/12/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/08/2014