Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/15/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/17/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/17/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/17/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/23/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/23/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/23/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/23/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/23/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/06/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/08/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/06/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 01/10/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/05/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/05/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/05/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 02/05/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 02/05/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/05/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/05/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/05/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/05/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/05/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 02/11/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 02/11/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/11/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/11/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/21/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/21/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 02/26/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/06/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 03/06/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/24/2014