Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/12/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/12/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 04/12/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/12/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/06/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/23/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 08/02/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 08/02/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 08/02/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 08/02/2013