Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 04/26/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/08/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/10/2014