Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 04/12/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 04/16/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/16/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/17/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/23/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/24/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/25/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 04/25/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 04/25/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/26/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/06/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/06/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/06/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/07/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/07/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/07/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/07/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/08/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/08/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/08/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 05/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/09/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/09/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/09/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/14/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 05/14/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/14/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/14/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/14/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 05/16/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/17/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 05/21/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/22/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/24/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/24/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 06/11/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/13/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/17/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/18/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/20/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/09/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 07/30/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/11/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/19/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/10/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/16/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/16/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 11/20/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/20/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/20/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/20/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/21/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 11/21/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 11/21/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 11/22/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 12/03/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/05/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 12/05/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 12/09/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 12/09/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/09/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 12/11/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/11/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/12/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 12/16/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 12/16/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/16/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/03/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/03/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/03/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 01/03/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/16/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/28/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/04/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/04/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/04/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/06/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/06/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 02/11/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/11/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/18/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/21/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/25/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/25/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/26/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/27/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/27/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 02/27/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/06/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 03/25/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/25/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 04/09/2014