Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/24/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/20/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/03/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/28/2014