Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/17/2013