Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/07/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 05/09/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 11/22/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/06/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/11/2014