Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/08/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/20/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/12/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/03/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/26/2014