Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/25/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 05/14/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/14/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 05/16/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/16/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 12/16/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/06/2014