Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/23/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/06/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/09/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/09/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 06/11/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/09/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/11/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/04/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 03/25/2014