Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/07/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/22/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/24/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 12/05/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/16/2013