Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/08/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/09/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/21/2013