Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/12/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 04/16/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/24/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/25/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/06/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/07/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/07/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/08/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/08/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/09/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/09/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/14/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/14/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/22/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/24/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 06/11/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/17/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/20/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 07/30/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/11/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/19/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/16/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 11/20/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/20/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/20/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/20/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/21/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 11/21/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 11/21/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/05/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 12/09/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 12/09/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/12/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 12/16/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/16/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/03/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/03/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 01/03/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/16/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/04/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/04/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 02/11/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/25/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/25/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/26/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/27/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 02/27/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/06/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 03/25/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/25/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 04/09/2014