Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/06/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/08/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/03/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/27/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/25/2014