Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/17/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/11/2014