Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/16/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/17/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/09/2013