Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/17/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/18/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/18/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 06/18/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/18/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/18/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/19/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/19/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/20/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/20/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/25/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 09/26/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/29/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 10/29/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/29/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 10/29/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 10/29/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/29/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 10/29/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 10/29/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 12/19/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/19/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/14/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/14/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 02/14/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/25/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 04/07/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/07/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/07/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/10/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/10/2014