Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 04/11/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/15/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/16/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/17/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/07/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/15/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/17/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/03/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/26/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/26/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/26/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/26/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/26/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/09/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/11/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/17/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/17/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/27/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/03/2014