Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 10/02/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 10/02/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 10/02/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 10/02/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 10/02/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/02/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 10/02/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/04/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 10/04/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/04/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/04/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/04/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/04/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/04/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/04/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/04/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/04/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/04/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 10/04/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/04/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 10/04/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 10/04/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 10/04/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/04/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/04/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/04/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/04/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/04/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/04/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 10/04/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 10/04/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/04/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/04/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/04/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 10/04/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/04/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 10/04/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/04/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/04/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/04/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/07/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/07/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 10/07/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/07/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/07/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/08/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/08/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 10/08/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 10/08/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 10/08/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 10/08/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 10/08/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/08/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/09/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/09/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/09/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 10/11/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 10/15/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/15/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/22/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 10/28/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/28/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 10/29/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/29/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 10/30/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 12/02/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/14/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/15/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 01/31/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/27/2014