Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-6] 01/04/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/04/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/04/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/04/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/04/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/04/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/04/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/14/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/15/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/15/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 01/23/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 01/23/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 01/23/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 01/23/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/04/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/04/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 02/14/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/14/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/15/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 02/15/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/26/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/04/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/04/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/12/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/09/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/18/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/26/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/06/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/20/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/03/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/05/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/18/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/25/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/18/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 08/01/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/09/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-8] 09/10/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/16/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/25/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/25/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 02/25/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/06/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/01/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/04/2014