Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/13/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/19/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 11/21/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/27/2014