Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/13/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/19/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/09/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 08/02/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 10/16/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 10/28/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 11/21/2013