Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/13/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/19/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/09/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/10/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/27/2014