Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 01/03/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/08/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/08/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/08/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/08/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/08/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 02/12/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 02/13/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 03/07/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/07/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/12/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/10/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/16/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 04/26/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 12/23/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/21/2014