Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 04/26/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/26/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/26/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/07/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/07/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/13/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 05/13/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/13/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 05/16/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/23/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/23/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/19/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/19/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/19/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/28/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/28/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/10/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/10/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/18/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/18/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/18/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/18/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/18/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/18/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/18/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 07/18/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/30/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 08/02/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/09/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/09/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/18/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/27/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/30/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/30/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/03/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/03/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/03/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/04/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/23/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 11/19/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 11/19/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 12/12/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 02/27/2014
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/05/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/14/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/25/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 03/25/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/25/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/08/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew