Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/26/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 04/26/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/07/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/21/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/11/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/23/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/13/2013