Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/11/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/17/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/11/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/18/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 12/19/2013