Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/16/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/16/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 04/16/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/16/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/16/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/16/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 04/16/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/18/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/18/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 04/18/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/18/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/18/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/18/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/18/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 04/24/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/24/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 04/24/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/26/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 04/26/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/26/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/26/2013