Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/16/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/16/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/16/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/16/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 04/16/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/16/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/16/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/16/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/16/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/16/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/16/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 04/16/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 04/16/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/18/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/18/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/18/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 04/18/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/18/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/18/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/18/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/18/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/18/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/18/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 04/24/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/24/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 04/24/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/24/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 04/24/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/26/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 04/26/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/26/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/26/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/06/2013