Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/25/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 04/25/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 04/30/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/15/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/15/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/15/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 05/24/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/24/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/11/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/11/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/19/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/19/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 07/19/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/19/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/19/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/23/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/30/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 09/12/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 12/03/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/24/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/24/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 03/24/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/24/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 03/24/2014