Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 04/09/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/12/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/18/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/18/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 04/24/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/24/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/14/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 05/23/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 06/11/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/11/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/11/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/14/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/20/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 06/20/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/20/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/25/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/27/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/28/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/09/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/11/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 07/11/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/16/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/16/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/18/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 07/18/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/25/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/25/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/25/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 09/10/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/10/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 09/10/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/03/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 10/03/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/09/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/09/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/15/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 10/15/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/15/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 10/30/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/12/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/19/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/02/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 12/02/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/02/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 12/11/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 01/07/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 01/07/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 01/07/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/15/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/11/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 03/12/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 04/07/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/08/2014