Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/15/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 04/15/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 04/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/15/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/15/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/15/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/15/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/15/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/15/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/15/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 04/15/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/15/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/15/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/16/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/17/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/17/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/17/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/17/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/17/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/17/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/17/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 04/17/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/19/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/19/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/23/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/23/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/23/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/23/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/25/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/25/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 04/26/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/26/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/26/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/03/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/03/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/03/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 05/03/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/03/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/07/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 05/07/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 05/07/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/07/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/08/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/13/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/13/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/13/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/16/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/22/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 05/23/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/03/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 06/03/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/04/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/05/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/10/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 06/10/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/10/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/11/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/12/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/17/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/18/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/20/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/09/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/10/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/11/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/11/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/30/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/30/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/30/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/25/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/27/2014