Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law (09/30/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on September 23, 2013. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Department of Veterans Affairs Expiring Authorities Act of 2013 - (Sec. 2) Authorizes specified appropriations for the period October 1-December 31, 2013, to pay a monthly assistance allowance to a veteran with a disability invited by the United States Olympic Committee (USOC) to compete for a slot on, or selected for, the Paralympic Team for any month in which the veteran is training or competing in any event sanctioned by the USOC, or who is residing at a USOC, training center.

Extends for the same period the authorization for grants to USOC for an integrated adaptive sports program for disabled veterans and disabled members of the Armed Forces.

Applies the same grant authorization, in the same manner and to the same degree as to the USOC, to: (1) the American Samoa National Olympic Committee, (2) the Guam National Olympic Committee, (3) the Comite Olimpico de Puerto Rico, and (4) appropriate entities representing the interests of the Northern Mariana Islands and the United States Virgin Islands.

Extends through FY2014 a veteran's liability for copayments of $10 for every day the veteran receives hospital care and of $5 for every day he or she receives nursing home care.

Extends through FY2014 the right of the United States to recover or collect from a third party reasonable charges for care or services for a non-service-connected disability of a veteran with a service-connected disability who is entitled to care (or payment of the expenses of care) under a health-plan contract.

Extends through FY2014 the authority of the Secretary of Labor for homeless veterans reintegration programs, and of the same Secretary and the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to contract for referral and counseling services for veterans at risk of homelessness who are transitioning from certain institutions.

Extends through FY2015 the authorization of appropriations for comprehensive service programs for homeless veterans.

Extends through FY2014 the availability of funds for: (1) financial assistance for supportive services for very low-income veteran families in permanent housing, and (2) the grant program for homeless veterans with special needs.

Extends through FY2014 specially adapted housing assistance for a disabled veteran whose permanent and total service-connected disability causes difficulty with ambulating. Limits to 30 applications during FY2014 approval of such assistance for any such disabled veterans who served in the Armed Forces on or after September 11, 2001.

Extends through FY2014 the authority to calculate, for liquidation purposes, the net value of real property securing a defaulted guaranteed housing or small business loan to a veteran.

Amends the Caregivers and Veterans Omnibus Health Services Act of 2010 to extend through FY2014 the pilot program to assess the feasibility and advisability of providing assistance to veterans receiving regular or intensive mental health services and other intensive health care services in order to obtain child care while receiving such services.

(Sec. 3) Amends part D (Child Support and Establishment of Paternity) of title IV (Temporary Assistance to Needy families) (TANF) of the Social Security Act to revive for a specified 180-day period the authority of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to furnish the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) with VA information for comparison with information in the National Directory of New Hires about individuals applying for or receiving needs-based veterans pension benefits, parents' dependency and indemnity compensation, veterans health care services, or compensation based on 100% unemployability.

Authorizes for the same 180-day period the authority of the VA Secretary to terminate, deny, suspend, or reduce any of such veterans benefits or services, with respect to an applicant or recipient under age 65, by reason of information obtained from the HHS Secretary, but only if the VA Secretary takes appropriate steps to verify independently information relating to the individual's employment and employment income.

(Sec. 4) Makes this Act effective on October 1, 2013, except for the authorization of appropriations for monthly assistance for disabled veterans invited to compete for a slot on, or selected for, the Paralympic Team, which shall be effective September 30, 2013.

Deems ratified any VA actions undertaken before enactment of this Act under the authorities extended by this Act, if this Act is not enacted on or before September 30, 2013.