Refine your search

Date Chamber Actions
09/18/2013 SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
09/17/2013-4:39pm HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5556-5557)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/17/2013-4:02pm HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1410.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/17/2013-4:02pm HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5556-5562)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/17/2013-4:02pm HouseMr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/17/2013 HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 154.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: House of Representatives
09/17/2013 HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-210.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/24/2013 HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 35 - 5.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/24/2013 HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/24/2013 HouseSubcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
05/16/2013 HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian and Alaska Native Affairs
04/15/2013 HouseReferred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
04/09/2013 HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
04/09/2013 HouseIntroduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives