Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 04/09/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/10/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/10/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 04/10/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 04/10/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 04/10/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/10/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/10/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/10/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 04/10/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 04/10/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/10/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/10/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 04/10/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/10/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/10/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/10/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/11/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/11/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 04/11/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/11/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/11/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 04/11/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/11/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/11/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/11/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/11/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/11/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/11/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/11/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/11/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/11/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/11/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/11/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/12/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 04/12/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/12/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/12/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/12/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/12/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 04/12/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/12/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/16/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/16/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/16/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 04/16/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/16/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/16/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/16/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/16/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/16/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/16/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 04/17/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 04/17/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 04/17/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/17/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/17/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/17/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/17/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 04/17/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/17/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/17/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/17/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 04/17/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/17/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/17/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/17/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/17/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 04/19/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/19/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/19/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/19/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/19/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/25/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 04/25/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/26/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 04/30/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/30/2013