Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 04/09/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 04/09/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/11/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 04/12/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 04/16/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/25/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/25/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/25/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 05/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/06/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/19/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/27/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/31/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 08/02/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/18/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/19/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 09/30/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 10/01/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/10/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 10/11/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/11/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 10/16/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 10/23/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 10/28/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 10/29/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/14/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/14/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/20/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 01/14/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/14/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 01/15/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/03/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/11/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/04/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/06/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/06/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 03/13/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 04/08/2014