Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 03/21/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 04/11/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/08/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/04/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/04/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/05/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/20/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/08/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/23/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/16/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/04/2014