Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/21/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/21/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/24/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/26/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/15/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/03/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/03/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/11/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/09/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/16/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/18/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/24/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 07/25/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 08/01/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/12/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 09/18/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/20/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/20/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/30/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/02/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 10/07/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/10/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/10/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/11/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/16/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/16/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 10/22/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/20/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 12/03/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 12/12/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/16/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/28/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/04/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/13/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 03/13/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/13/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/24/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 03/24/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/02/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/04/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/10/2014