Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 04/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/09/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/09/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/12/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/18/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/18/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/16/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/16/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/16/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/16/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/20/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 06/14/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/14/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/28/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/22/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 09/12/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 01/07/2014