Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/25/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/26/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/14/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 03/18/2014