Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 03/20/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/20/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/20/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 03/20/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 03/20/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 03/20/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/21/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/21/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/09/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/09/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 04/09/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/09/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/09/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/10/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/10/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/10/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/10/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/11/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/16/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/17/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/17/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/17/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/17/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/18/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/23/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/23/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/23/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/08/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 05/08/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 05/08/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/21/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 06/20/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/20/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/11/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 07/11/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 07/18/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 07/18/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/19/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/25/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/25/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 07/31/2013